U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Acevedo-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Appearance at Arraignment Entry of Not Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 09, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.