U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00636
  • Case Name: Herpin v. Scott et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Designation of Experts]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.