U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Iortoman et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 09, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • April 09, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
  • April 08, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.