U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00247
  • Case Name: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company v. ASC Engineered Solutions, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 16, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 14, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.