U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Isaiah Kyle Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 09, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 11, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 11, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 10, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.