U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00706
  • Case Name: Waits v. Hinds County, Mississippi et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Subpoena Returned]
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Admissions]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 25, 2025: [Case Management Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Request for Production]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice of Service of Interrogatories]
  • April 25, 2025: [Telephonic Case Management Conference]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.