U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00252
  • Case Name: Thompson v. Multi-South Management Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Disclosure]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • April 10, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.