U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-cv-00051
  • Case Name: King v. Magnolia Healthcare, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service of Response to Request for Production]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Settlement Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [Extend Deadline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.