U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Edgefield Holdings, LLC v. Ellis et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 06, 2025: [Summons Reissued]
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Reissued]
  • April 25, 2025: [Summons Returned Unexecuted]
  • April 17, 2025: [Remark]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.