U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00262
  • Case Name: Musee, LLC v. Highland Hill Capital, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • May 05, 2025: [Order Staying Discovery]
  • May 05, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 02, 2025: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [State Court Record]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 22, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 21, 2025: [Rule 16(a) Initial Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.