U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BURNS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 29, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 29, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.