U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00264
  • Case Name: Lutzenberger v. Airslate Legal Forms, Inc
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 29, 2025: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS OR DISCOVERY]
  • April 15, 2025: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • April 15, 2025: [Remark]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.