U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Booker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 18, 2025: [Trial/Hearing Exhibit (Sealed)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other) - DO NOT USE FOR APPEALS]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 16, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 16, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 16, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 15, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.