U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v.Triplett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Notice of Calendar Setting]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 16, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 16, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 16, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 16, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 16, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.