U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Franklin et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 23, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 18, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 17, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.