U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-01044-
  • Case Name: Thompson v. RW Sales, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Discovery]
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Answer to Complaint]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Order (Generic)]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Exhibit/Witness List]
  • April 24, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Hearing Held]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Expedite Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.