U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-02866-
  • Case Name: Kailey D Cahoon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Harold J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Harold J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing (Bankruptcy)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Harold J. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Harold J. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document (without motion)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Harold J. [Dismiss/Withdraw Document (without motion)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Harold J. [Hearing Set (JAW)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Harold J. [Objection]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Harold J. [Amended Order Upon Debtor Directing Payments to Trustee]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.