U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-00001-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cockerham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Digital Audio File]
  • April 25, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Exhibit List]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 17, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 17, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 17, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 17, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.