U.S. Federal Court Records for the Northern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-11240
  • Case Name: Ora McCrutchen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [BNC Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Extend/Shorten Time]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Objection]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Extend/Shorten Time]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [BNC Certificate of Service]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [BNC Certificate of Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [BNC Certificate of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Hearing Set (Document) Video]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Notice of Deficiency]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Clerk's Request for Corrective Action (3)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Barkley, Locke D. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.