U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valle-Alvarez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: [Notice of Intent To Change Plea To Guilty]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 06, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Praecipe for Summons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.