U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crechale et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 30, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 30, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver]
  • April 29, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 29, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Praecipe for Warrant]
  • April 23, 2025: [Restricted Document]
  • April 23, 2025: [Indictment - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.