U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tobias et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • April 30, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 29, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 29, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 28, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 28, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 24, 2025: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.