U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of Mississippi

mississippi Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of Mississippi
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Budinich
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2025: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2025: [Notice of Assignment (Probation)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 01, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Regarding Discovery]
  • April 30, 2025: [Brady Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Trial Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 30, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 30, 2025: [Unseal Case]
  • April 30, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.