open-public-records

U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00995-1
    Party Name:USA v. Jefferson
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:July 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 08, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:May 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment and Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:November 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Warrant/Summons - 12C]
    Date Published:October 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:September 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:May 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:March 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Entry of Felony Plea Before Magistrate]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply Suggestions to Motion]
    Date Published:January 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Computation Summary - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:January 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:December 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Examination or Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:December 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:December 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:December 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:December 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:November 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Re: Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order to Unseal Case]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:November 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:August 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL)]
    Date Published:August 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:August 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Eligibility Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:June 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment (Fine/Costs/Restitution)]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Forfeiture/Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:May 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:May 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:May 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:April 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:April 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Case and Appointing FPD (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:February 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:January 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Ownership]
    Date Published:January 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:January 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Unsealed]
    Date Published:January 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:December 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:December 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:October 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:August 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Call Witnesses at Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:December 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:December 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting PSR Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:October 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection to Report and Recommendation]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Receipt]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations - IRS Summons]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Suppress]
    Date Published:August 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response in Opposition]
    Date Published:July 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Post Trial/Post Hearing Brief]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Witness List]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Evidentiary Hearing (links/refers to motions only)]
    Date Published:July 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:July 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Indictment/Counts]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:May 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:April 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:April 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 21 - Payment Voucher for Expert Services]
    Date Published:March 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Designated Clerk's Record]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 24 - Transcript Authorization to Pay]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter from USCA]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:November 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (Financial)]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Return of Surety (Bond)]
    Date Published:November 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter of Transfer In]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:October 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prelminary Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:September 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Conference]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Information]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:August 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:July 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Judgment]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:June 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:December 04, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?136603
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =