open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00001-1
    Party Name:USA v. Aubuchon
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:April 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:April 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion (SEALED)]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:January 09, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:May 28, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:March 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:March 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:January 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:January 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:November 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:October 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:April 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:March 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:March 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:March 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:January 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:January 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:January 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:November 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:September 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Judgment]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:September 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pretrial Memorandum/Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:August 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Intent to Call Witnesses at Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:August 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:June 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?93721
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =