open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00557-1
    Party Name:USA v. Griffin
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:August 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment and Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:August 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:July 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:July 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Psychiatric Report - SEALED]
    Date Published:June 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Clerk's Order of Reassignment (District Judge or Magistrate)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:April 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:April 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:April 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:March 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral]
    Date Published:January 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter re:Writ of Certiorari filed w/US Supreme Court]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Informal Matters]
    Date Published:October 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Continued Detention]
    Date Published:October 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:August 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment Challenge (Post-Plea) re: Rehaif]
    Date Published:August 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Opinion from USCA]
    Date Published:July 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Modify Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:June 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:May 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Computation Summary - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:April 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Warrant/Summons - 12C]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:February 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suppress]
    Date Published:February 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:December 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:December 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Records Transmittal]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript (FILED UNDER SEAL)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Designated Clerk's Record]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order Appointing Attorney]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification from USCA]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:October 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:October 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:October 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exclude]
    Date Published:September 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Returned Executed/Unexecuted]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:August 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing / Re-Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:July 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Custody Directives and Order Transferring Custody]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:April 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea and Sentence]
    Date Published:April 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count/Case]
    Date Published:April 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Waiver (Post Hearing)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Information]
    Date Published:March 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:March 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Count/Case]
    Date Published:March 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:February 28, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:February 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:February 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:February 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:January 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:December 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion and Order to dismiss complaint]
    Date Published:November 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order Terminating Counsel]
    Date Published:October 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:October 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:October 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:October 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:September 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:September 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Order]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:August 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:August 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Court Hearing (Waiver of Motions)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Travel]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Travel]
    Date Published:July 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:July 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:July 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge - Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:July 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:June 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter of Transfer In]
    Date Published:June 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation 22 Documents Received]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Dismissal by Government]
    Date Published:February 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss by Government (indictment/defendant from case)]
    Date Published:December 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Satisfaction of Judgment (Fine/Costs/Restitution)]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:September 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Examination or Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:August 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transcript Order Request]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Out]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Transmittal (Sent to USCA or Returned by USCA)]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:June 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:June 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 20 - Transfer In]
    Date Published:June 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supervised Release/Probation Revocation Sentencing Computation - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:May 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Passport Notice]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Bond]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5(c)(3) Removal (Identity) Hearing]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)(magistrate arrest case only)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Arrest on Rule 5(c)(3)]
    Date Published:May 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Complaint - Out]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Abstract of Judgment]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Amended]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:January 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Motion]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restitution Questionnaire]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:November 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Prelminary Order for Forfeiture of Property]
    Date Published:November 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing - Guilty]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Recommendations & Stip]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Indictment]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:October 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:August 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:August 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:August 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Execution]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:August 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:August 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:July 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:July 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:July 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revoke]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring/Reassigning Case]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:April 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:January 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence Re: Drug/Chemical Qty Table - Amendment 782]
    Date Published:November 25, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:November 19, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?90610
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =