open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:14-cv-00159
    Party Name:Prater v. Medicredit, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:October 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:December 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)]
    Date Published:July 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certify Class]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?131800
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =