open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:16-cv-00047
    Party Name:Dennis v. Colvin
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment - (Case)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum & Order]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Cross Brief (govt only)]
    Date Published:September 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:July 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Brief]
    Date Published:June 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript of certified administrative hearing]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Full Consent to a Magistrate]
    Date Published:March 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
    Date Published:March 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Letter Magistrate Consent Social Security]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Order]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Social Security)]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerk's Judgment]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion to extend Social Security Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 26, 2014
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summons Issued as to USA]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?118493
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =