open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:18-cr-00668-1
    Party Name:USA v. Finley
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:January 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amendment/Supplemental Pleading]
    Date Published:January 15, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:January 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Letter]
    Date Published:December 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:December 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Forth Trial Procedures in Criminal Case]
    Date Published:August 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:July 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:May 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference]
    Date Published:April 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:September 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:August 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:August 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notification]
    Date Published:August 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:August 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:August 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:August 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:[CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Complaint]
    Date Published:July 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:June 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Show Cause]
    Date Published:February 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:February 09, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Exhibit List]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Witness List]
    Date Published:February 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:February 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Suggestions in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:January 31, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:January 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restitution Judgment]
    Date Published:December 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:November 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reply to Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:October 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:September 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:May 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:April 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:January 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Order]
    Date Published:August 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:August 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:June 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:May 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Hearing]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Answer to Writ of Garnishment]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Notification and/or Briefing Schedule from USCA]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notification of Appeal and NOA Supplement]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ]
    Date Published:April 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:March 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:January 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Case and Appointing FPD (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence (2014 Drug Guidelines Amendment 782)]
    Date Published:December 11, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:October 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Returned Executed/Unexecuted]
    Date Published:October 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:October 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion for Order (Sealed)]
    Date Published:September 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:September 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:August 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Trial Brief]
    Date Published:July 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:July 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:July 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Show Cause Hearing]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 05, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation 22 Documents Received]
    Date Published:December 02, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:December 01, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Supervised Release]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?106977
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =