open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:11-30100-can13
    Party Name:Jerry Lee Harmon and Helen Elizabeth Harmon ABOVE MED
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Notice of Final Report (b)]
    Date Published:October 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m) AMENDED]
    Date Published:October 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion (AMENDED)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Close Bankruptcy Case - Ch 11/12/13]
    Date Published:June 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ntc Final Cure Mortgage Payment APPROVED]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response in Agreement to Ntc of Final Cure Pmt Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:May 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Order Final Account Ch 13 (COMPLETE)(m)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Final Report - Completion]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing Called and Continued]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Reply]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Hearing on Document]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Response in Opposition to Ntc of Final Cure Pmt Rule 3002.1]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Chapter 13 Discharge]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [13 Trustee Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 FMC Notice re Discharge]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [CSAW Cancel Wage]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Ch 13 Trustee Ntc of Plan Completion]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:September 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Fink, Richard [Post-Confirmation Fees]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.mowb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?273790
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =