open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:10-51344
    Party Name:William M Strobl and Brenda L Strobl
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [Final Decree Auto Closing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:October 21, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [Bounce Back E-mails]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [Trustee's Initial Report]
    Date Published:August 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:July 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [Relief from Stay]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Lopinot, Mary E. [none]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?321011
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =