open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:05-cr-00158-1
    Party Name:USA v. Fields
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: First Step Act]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appoint Counsel]
    Date Published:June 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Restitution Judgment]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Case and Appointing FPD (FIRST STEP Act of 2018)]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reduce Sentence (FIRST STEP Act of 2018)]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons (Sealed)]
    Date Published:August 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Marshal's Return on Judgment]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:June 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count/Case]
    Date Published:June 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court]
    Date Published:May 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Count/Case]
    Date Published:May 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on motion for order]
    Date Published:May 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [NextGen Remark]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:May 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report (Sealed)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:March 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:December 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:December 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 02, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Returned Executed/Unexecuted]
    Date Published:November 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Dismissal by Government]
    Date Published:August 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Dismiss Indictment/Counts]
    Date Published:August 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing / Re-Sentencing]
    Date Published:July 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:July 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Docket Modification]
    Date Published:July 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Seal Document]
    Date Published:July 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum (Sealed)]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA 20 - Appointment of Attorney]
    Date Published:July 03, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Attorney Withdrawal]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:June 06, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:June 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:May 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Determination by Court of Admissibility of Arguably Suppressible Evidence)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (Suppress)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:April 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial / Supervised Release]
    Date Published:April 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Entry of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:[Affidavit]
    Date Published:April 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Stipulation]
    Date Published:January 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment - Re-Sentencing]
    Date Published:January 22, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance of Plea and Adjudication of Guilt]
    Date Published:December 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:December 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Regarding Entry of a Plea of Guilty]
    Date Published:November 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Superseding Indictment]
    Date Published:September 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:August 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:[~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 08, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Receipt]
    Date Published:May 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment Returned Executed]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:January 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:[Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:[Complaint]
    Date Published:November 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Pro Se Motion]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transmission of Notice of Appeal Supplement to US Court of Appeals]
    Date Published:November 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
    Date Published:November 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Exhibit Index]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment-Supervised Release Revocation]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minutes (generic set/reset/satisfy schedules only)]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Judgment and Commitment]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:August 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:August 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:August 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appear]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [USCA Judgment and/or Opinion]
    Date Published:August 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Court]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Documents Received]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Report: Relief Re: Johnson]
    Date Published:June 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing Cancellation]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Pretrial conference]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate (2255)]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set Aside Sentence ]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:March 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Counsel Under CJA]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ Issued]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Relief Re: Johnson]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Affidavit of Financial Status]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Remark Sealing/Unsealing Indictment]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest ]
    Date Published:December 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Appeal Record Sent to USCA]
    Date Published:June 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment for Revocation]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Statement of Reasons]
    Date Published:June 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Electronic Transcript]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Supervised Release/Probation Revocation Sentencing Computation - FILED UNDER SEAL]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation or Prob/Sup Release or Pretrial Action]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Unrestricted Petition for Action on Conditions or Term of Supervision]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Probation Form 49 Waiver]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bail Report]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Memorandum and Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:March 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:January 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:January 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?84020
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =