open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:17-41824
    Party Name:Thomas A. Kilwin and Rebecca A Kilwin
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [**AUTO** Final Decree Auto Closing (13)]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [**AUTO** AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:May 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
    Date Published:March 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Order Discharging Debtor after Completion of Plan (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Personal Financial Management Course- Agency]
    Date Published:March 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Notice of 522q Objection to Discharge Deadline]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Reminder Notice of Domestic Support Obligations]
    Date Published:March 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Return Excess Funds (batch)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Motion to Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Motion to Return Excess Funds (batch)]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Change of Address]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:July 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Held - Plan Confirmed]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response]
    Date Published:December 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Consent]
    Date Published:October 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Reinstate Case]
    Date Published:October 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:September 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:August 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Amended Schedules]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:July 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (batch)]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Meeting of Creditors Held]
    Date Published:May 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:May 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Correspondence]
    Date Published:May 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Official Form 122]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:May 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [341 Meeting Continued - Payment Advice Documents Due]
    Date Published:April 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Creditor Request for Notices (M)]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
    Date Published:April 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Extend Time]
    Date Published:April 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Errors in Electronically Filed Proof of Claim]
    Date Published:March 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:March 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [none]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Attorney Fee Election Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Dismiss Case Order]
    Date Published:March 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Trustee Tansfer Event for ADI]
    Date Published:February 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Held]
    Date Published:February 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Retain Tax Refund and/or Ratify Tax Return]
    Date Published:January 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Withdraw Document]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Objection]
    Date Published:September 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Hearing Continued]
    Date Published:September 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Retain Tax Refund]
    Date Published:August 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Response]
    Date Published:July 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (batch)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Trustee's Intent to Pay Claims]
    Date Published:September 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?378453
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =