U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 12-51267
  • Case Name: William T. Crudup and Thelma Crudup
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Final Decree Auto Closing (13)]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account (batch)]
January, 2018
  • January 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Discharging Debtor Ch. 13 After Completion]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Notice of 522q Objection to Discharge Deadline]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Chapter 13 Reminder Notice of Domestic Support Obligations]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Return Excess Funds (batch)]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Motion to Terminate Payroll Deduction (batch)]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Trustee's Motion to Return Excess Funds (batch)]
December, 2017
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Domestic Support Obligations]
  • December 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Final Cure Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Generic Order]
June, 2017
  • June 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Generic Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Daugherty, Diana S. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
August, 2016
  • August 04, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
July, 2016
  • July 13, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • July 11, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Motion and Order Approving Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2016
  • May 13, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • May 11, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Generic Order]
April, 2016
  • April 04, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Generic Motion]
August, 2015
  • August 10, 2015: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: LaBarge, John V. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.