U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-41000
  • Case Name: David Jason Schenberg
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2016
  • June 01, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Final Decree Auto Closing]
  • June 01, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
May, 2016
  • May 20, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • May 17, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
  • May 13, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Reaffirmation / Redemption Agreement]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Reaffirmation / Redemption Agreement]
  • April 22, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Reaffirmation / Redemption Agreement]
March, 2016
  • March 17, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • March 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Trustee's Initial Report]
  • March 08, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Personal Financial Management Course]
February, 2016
  • February 24, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • February 21, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • February 19, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • February 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
  • February 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
  • February 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [none]
  • February 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • February 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Sosne, David A. [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
  • February 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.