U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

missouri Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-46288
  • Case Name: Kelvin Samlalsingh
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
March, 2017
  • March 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • March 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Final Decree]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • March 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Discharging Debtor Ch. 7]
  • February 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Extend Time]
  • February 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Withdraw Document]
  • February 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • February 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Avoid Lien]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Extend Time]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Notice of Errors in Electronically Filed Documents - Refile Required]
  • February 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • January 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Avoid Lien]
  • January 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Reopen Case]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Reopen Case (Chapter 7)]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [none]
  • January 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Financial Management Course]
December, 2016
  • December 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Final Decree]
  • December 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Case Closed Without Discharge]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Meeting of Creditors Held]
  • December 14, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
October, 2016
  • October 19, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • October 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Support/Supplement]
  • October 17, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Reminder Notice of Financial Management Course]
  • October 05, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Debtor Failed to Appear)]
September, 2016
  • September 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Chapter 7 Official Form 122]
  • September 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Statement of Intent]
  • September 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • September 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules]
  • September 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Schedules A-J]
  • September 28, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • September 18, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • September 16, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Extend Time]
  • September 14, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Extend Time]
  • September 03, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • September 03, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 01, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
  • September 01, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Radloff, Stuart Jay [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
August, 2016
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [none]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
  • August 31, 2016: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.