open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00107-1
    Party Name:USA v. Gomez-Castro
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Receipt]
    Date Published:April 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 12.07]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:December 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:November 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:September 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:July 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:July 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:June 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Interpreter Usage Report]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?172232
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 1 =