open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00114-1
    Party Name:USA v. Sencibaugh
  • Filing Type:Criminal [SOR/PersID/Reason for AmdJgm]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:March 11, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [For Leave to File Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:March 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing Document (by Government)]
    Date Published:March 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Acceptance to Presentence Investigation Report]
    Date Published:February 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:July 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:June 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:June 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:June 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:June 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:June 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:June 12, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?172247
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =