open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cv-02345
    Party Name:Choden v. Saul
  • Filing Type:Civil [Social Security Brief]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:November 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript of certified administrative hearing]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Answer]
    Date Published:October 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Full Consent to a Magistrate]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Entry of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Opening Notification]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (Social Security)]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?173977
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =