open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00567-1
    Party Name:USA v. O'Conner
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:January 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Disclosure of Arguably Suppressible Evidence]
    Date Published:August 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 13, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?173269
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 1 =