open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00153-1
    Party Name:USA v. Kellogg
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:January 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:December 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:November 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
    Date Published:October 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:September 24, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 12, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174824
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 3 =