open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00151-1
    Party Name:USA v. Ice
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:November 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:October 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral (For Extension of Time to File Pretrial Motions by Defendant)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174820
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 3 =