open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00297-1
    Party Name:USA v. Triana-Perez
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:December 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSI]
    Date Published:December 18, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Transfer Order (ADMIN USE ONLY!)]
    Date Published:October 09, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling and Trial Order]
    Date Published:October 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?148036
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =