open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00739-1
    Party Name:USA v. Matthew Terrell Ralph
  • Filing Type:Criminal [In Limine]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:February 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:February 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Letter]
    Date Published:December 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 22, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:November 21, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Oral]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 04, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sealed Motion (no service occurs via CM/ECF)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:October 17, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Terminate Motions]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174687
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =