open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:1:19-cr-00155-1
    Party Name:USA v. McCree
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip Supplement]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement, Guidelines Rec & Stip]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:January 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order to Continue per 18:3161 - Ends of Justice (Speedy Trial Order)]
    Date Published:December 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue]
    Date Published:December 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Regarding Pretrial Motion Status]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:November 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:October 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:October 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Discovery]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:September 23, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:September 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:September 19, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:September 11, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?174830
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =