open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:19-cr-00940-1
    Party Name:USA v. McGlosson
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:April 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver of Filing Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:April 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:February 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Extension]
    Date Published:January 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extension]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:December 05, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Detain]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:December 02, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:November 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention and Hearing]
    Date Published:November 26, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08]
    Date Published:November 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum (Order)]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Issued]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment - Redacted]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:November 08, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?176441
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =