open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:20-mj-01039-1
    Party Name:USA v. Hangge
  • Filing Type:[Order of Detention (non-motion - court's ruling only)]
    Date Published:February 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:[CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Waiver of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearings]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Arrest]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:[Rule 5 Complaint - Out]
    Date Published:February 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
    Date Published:January 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Transferring Custody]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 21, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.mowd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?150101
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =