open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:4:20-cr-00366-1
    Party Name:USA v. Delashmit
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order (rule motion and set or satisfy schedule)]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Bond Hearing]
    Date Published:September 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [A Docket Text Order with Schedules]
    Date Published:September 03, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Discovery Letter]
    Date Published:August 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Reassignment or Recusal]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Concerning Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Request for Discovery]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Entry of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Appointing Public Defender]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Rule 5 Papers]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [CJA Form 23 - Financial Affidavit]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:August 07, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.moed.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?181767
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =