open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:20-44899
    Party Name:Barbara M Whitfield
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
    Date Published:October 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Statement of Intent]
    Date Published:October 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Statement of Financial Affairs]
    Date Published:October 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:October 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
    Date Published:October 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules]
    Date Published:October 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Chapter 7 Official Form 122]
    Date Published:October 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [14-Day Order and Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [**AUTO** Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Internet Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Internet Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [**AUTO** Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [**AUTO** Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438449
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =