open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri

MISSOURI PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Eastern District of Missouri
    Case Number:20-44901
    Party Name:Maurice Antwon Grissom and Nikita Shamatez Grissom
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Personal Financial Management Course- Agency]
    Date Published:October 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:October 21, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:October 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Creditor Request for Notices]
    Date Published:October 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [**AUTO** Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Internet Credit Card Receipt]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [B121 Form (DO NOT COMBINE WITH OTHER EVENTS)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Conwell, Kristin J [**AUTO** Voluntary Petition - Attorney (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:October 17, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.moeb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?438451
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =